MA H873 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2404
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 59-10)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2404
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2404
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to promote healthy soils and agricultural innovation. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
To promote healthy soils and agricultural innovation within the Commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-14 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2404 |
2019-05-09 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 05/14/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-05-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/14/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S438 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2404
S2404 (Replaced by) 2019-11-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2404 (Replaced by) 2019-11-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H873 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H873.pdf |