MA S438 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2404
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-5)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2404
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2404
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to promote healthy soils and agricultural innovation within the Commonwealth. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
To promote healthy soils and agricultural innovation within the Commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-14 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2404 |
2019-05-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/14/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H2479 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
S92 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2533
H437 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4426
H1220 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5125
H868 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S484 (Similar To) 2019-06-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2254
S2022 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S493 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2540
H2069 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5117
S1290 (Similar To) 2019-12-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2449
S2254 (Similar To) 2019-06-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2277 (Similar To) 2020-01-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S2399 (Similar To) 2020-01-16 - New draft substituted, see S2459
S2404 (Replaced by) 2019-11-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2422 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Rules
S2426 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S92 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2533
H437 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4426
H1220 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5125
H868 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S484 (Similar To) 2019-06-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2254
S2022 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S493 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2540
H2069 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5117
S1290 (Similar To) 2019-12-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2449
S2254 (Similar To) 2019-06-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2277 (Similar To) 2020-01-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S2399 (Similar To) 2020-01-16 - New draft substituted, see S2459
S2404 (Replaced by) 2019-11-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2422 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Rules
S2426 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S438 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S438.pdf |