MA H826 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 56-9)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Reporting date extended to Friday June 14, 2024, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Reporting date extended to Friday June 14, 2024, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to further regulate the retail sale of certain domestic animals in new pet shops. Environment and Natural Resources.
Title
Banning the retail sale of dogs, cats, and rabbits in new pet shops
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday June 14, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-08 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday April 12, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-10-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/08/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment and Natural Resources |
Same As/Similar To
S549 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - House concurred
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H826 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H826.pdf |