MA S549 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-4)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - House concurred
Pending: Joint Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - House concurred
Pending: Joint Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to ban the retail sale of dogs, cats, and rabbits in new pet shops. Environment and Natural Resources.
Title
Banning the retail sale of dogs, cats, and rabbits in new pet shops
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | House | House concurred |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Friday April 12, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-10-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/08/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment and Natural Resources |
Same As/Similar To
S550 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - House concurred
S460 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2649
H826 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Reporting date extended to Friday June 14, 2024, pending concurrence
S2447 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Reporting date extended to Saturday June 1, 2024, pending concurrence
S2687 (Similar To) 2024-04-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S460 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2649
H826 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Reporting date extended to Friday June 14, 2024, pending concurrence
S2447 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Reporting date extended to Saturday June 1, 2024, pending concurrence
S2687 (Similar To) 2024-04-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S549 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S549.pdf |