MA H82 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Joint session held and recessed to Monday, November 21, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to prohibiting eminent domain takings. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proposal for a legislative amendment to the Constitution prohibiting eminent domain takings

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-04-11JointJoint session held and recessed to Monday, November 21, 2022
2021-10-25JointJoint session held and recessed to Monday, April 11, 2022
2021-06-09JointJoint session held and recessed to Monday, October 25, 2021
2021-05-12JointJoint session held and recessed to Wednesday, June 9, 2021
2021-05-10HouseCalled for consideration in the joint session
2021-05-06HousePlaced on file, in concurrence
2021-04-29SenateProposal for Constitutional Amendment reported adversely by committee and placed on file
2021-03-30JointHearing scheduled for 04/06/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-04SenateSenate concurred
2021-03-01HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S5 (Similar To) 2021-06-09 - Amendment again agreed to - see Senate Roll Call #48 and House Roll Call #38 (Yeas 159 to Nays 41)
S2440 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Joint session held and recessed to Monday, November 21, 2022
S2402 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Resolution reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H3658 (Similar To) 2022-05-17 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, question of adoption

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback