MA H791 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4146
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4146
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4146
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the licensing of a third burner at the Wheelabrator facility in the town of Saugus. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
To prohibit licensing by the Department of Environmental Protection at the Wheelabrator facility in the town of Saugus
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-05 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4146 |
2013-07-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/09/2013 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1 |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-04-03 | House | Discharged to the House Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H4146 (Replaced by) 2014-06-05 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H791 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H791.pdf |