MA H787 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the management of the deer population at the Blue Hills Reservation. Environment and Natural Resources.
Title
Relative to the management of the Blue Hills Reservation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2023-11-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/29/2023 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment and Natural Resources |
Same As/Similar To
H785 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H787 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H787.pdf |