MA H785 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the administration of the Blue Hills Reservation Trust Fund by the Department of Conservation and Recreation. Environment and Natural Resources.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing transparency for the Blue Hills Reservation Trust Fund

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-21HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
2023-09-28JointHearing scheduled for 10/11/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
2023-02-16SenateSenate concurred
2023-02-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Environment and Natural Resources

Same As/Similar To

H3566 (Similar To) 2024-05-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4593
S2427 (Similar To) 2024-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4109 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - House Committee of conference membership changed (Gregoire-Fluker Oakley-Kane).
S2637 (Similar To) 2024-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4634

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback