MA H716 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5135
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5135
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5135
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to award school districts and individual schools that show excellence in producing and promoting civics projects. Education.
Title
Creating an inclusive vision for implementing civics studies (CIVICS)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-25 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5135 |
2021-09-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/13/2021 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H1390 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
H574 (Similar To) 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5135
H599 (Similar To) 2022-08-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5136
H667 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4542
H541 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2727
H638 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Accompanied H674
S472 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S340 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S385 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2755
S341 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S291 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S395 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2727
H5135 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H574 (Similar To) 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5135
H599 (Similar To) 2022-08-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5136
H667 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4542
H541 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2727
H638 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Accompanied H674
S472 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S340 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S385 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2755
S341 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S291 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S395 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2727
H5135 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H716 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H716.pdf |