MA S341 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to modernize student transportation. Education.
Title
Modernizing student transportation
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Hinds [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-07 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2021-06-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/06/2021 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S287 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
H638 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Accompanied H674
H580 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Accompanied H674
H626 (Similar To) 2022-08-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5136
H674 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3279 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1520 (Similar To) 2022-03-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4499
S488 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
S185 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S306 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2727
H638 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Accompanied H674
H580 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Accompanied H674
H626 (Similar To) 2022-08-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5136
H674 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3279 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1520 (Similar To) 2022-03-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4499
S488 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
S185 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S306 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2727
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S341 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S341.pdf |