MA H574 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-09-03 - Hearing scheduled for 09/13/2021 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
Pending: Joint Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to requiring high school students to pass a civics test for prior to graduation. Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to civic test requirements for graduation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-03JointHearing scheduled for 09/13/2021 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29SenateSenate concurred
2021-03-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Education

Same As/Similar To

H610 (Similar To) 2021-07-28 - Read second and ordered to a third reading

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback