MA H659 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5074
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5074
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5074
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to require the disclosure to parents of standardized student assessments from kindergarten through twelfth grade. Education.
Title
Requiring school districts, with the assistance of the department of elementary and secondary education, to disclose information about required assessments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-25 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5074 |
2021-09-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/20/2021 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S324 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S845 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
H657 (Similar To) 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5074
H5074 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S845 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
H657 (Similar To) 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5074
H5074 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H659 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H659.pdf |