MA H645 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5093
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5093
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5093
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the use of computer-adaptive assessments in public schools. Education.
Title
Relative to the use of computer-adaptive assessments in K-12 education
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-25 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5093 |
2021-06-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2021 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S322 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S323 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S2493 (Similar To) 2021-07-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S329 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S326 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S327 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S353 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2755
H627 (Similar To) 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5073
S1382 (Similar To) 2021-12-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S338 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2748
S1445 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - New draft substituted, see S2730
S250 (Similar To) 2022-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4938
S294 (Similar To) 2021-07-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2493
S295 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
H5093 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3442 (Similar To) 2021-09-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4113
H2868 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H1162 (Similar To) 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5235
H2149 (Similar To) 2022-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4933
S323 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S2493 (Similar To) 2021-07-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S329 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S326 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S327 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S353 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2755
H627 (Similar To) 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5073
S1382 (Similar To) 2021-12-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S338 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2748
S1445 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - New draft substituted, see S2730
S250 (Similar To) 2022-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4938
S294 (Similar To) 2021-07-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2493
S295 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
H5093 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3442 (Similar To) 2021-09-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4113
H2868 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H1162 (Similar To) 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5235
H2149 (Similar To) 2022-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4933
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H645 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H645.pdf |