MA H641 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5093
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5093
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5093
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to academic acceleration of students in kindergarten through grade twelve. Education.
Title
Relative to academic acceleration of K-12 students
Sponsors
Rep. James Kelcourse [R] | Rep. Meghan Kilcoyne [D] | Sen. Diana DiZoglio [D] | Sen. Harriette Chandler [D] |
Rep. Mathew Muratore [R] | Rep. Carmine Gentile [D] | Rep. Ruth Balser [D] | Rep. Jack Lewis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-25 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5093 |
2021-06-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2021 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H3865 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4541
H611 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S321 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2751
S287 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S2496 (Similar To) 2021-07-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3999 (Similar To) 2021-10-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 62 of the Acts of 2021
S2518 (Similar To) 2022-09-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 226 of the Acts of 2022
S329 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S1464 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2781
S384 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S313 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
H540 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S333 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S1861 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4894
S289 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S1588 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H5055 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S3082 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5093 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S356 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2755
H2797 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S327 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
H611 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S321 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2751
S287 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S2496 (Similar To) 2021-07-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3999 (Similar To) 2021-10-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 62 of the Acts of 2021
S2518 (Similar To) 2022-09-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 226 of the Acts of 2022
S329 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S1464 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2781
S384 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S313 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
H540 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S333 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S1861 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4894
S289 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S1588 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H5055 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S3082 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5093 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S356 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2755
H2797 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S327 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H641 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H641.pdf |