MA H633 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5135
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5135
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5135
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to parental options of enrolling children in elective courses involving sexual education rather than opting out of mandatory courses. Education.
Title
Relative to parental notification
Sponsors
Rep. Bradley Jones [R] | Rep. Susan Gifford [R] | Rep. Angelo D'Emilia [R] | Rep. Paul Frost [R] |
Rep. Mathew Muratore [R] | Rep. Steven Howitt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-25 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5135 |
2021-09-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/13/2021 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S284 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S318 (Similar To) 2021-07-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2495
S2495 (Similar To) 2021-09-23 - New draft substituted, see S2534
S2541 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2534 (Similar To) 2021-09-23 - Reprinted as amended, see S2541
H5135 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S318 (Similar To) 2021-07-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2495
S2495 (Similar To) 2021-09-23 - New draft substituted, see S2534
S2541 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2534 (Similar To) 2021-09-23 - Reprinted as amended, see S2541
H5135 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H633 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H633.pdf |