MA H630 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5143
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5143
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5143
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Jones of North Reading, a petition of Bradley H. Jones, Jr., and others that schools be required to maintain non-patient specific epinephrine auto-injectors to be used in the event of anaphylactic emergencies. Education.
Title
Relative to emergency stock epinephrine in schools
Sponsors
Rep. Bradley Jones [R] | Rep. Susan Gifford [R] | Rep. Angelo D'Emilia [R] | Rep. Paul Frost [R] |
Rep. Hannah Kane [R] | Rep. Kimberly Ferguson [R] | Rep. Mathew Muratore [R] | Rep. Steven Howitt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-01 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5143 |
2021-12-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/04/2022 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H604 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5201
H556 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied H604
H5143 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H556 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied H604
H5143 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H630 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H630.pdf |