MA H556 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-07-21 - Accompanied H604
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to emergency stock supply of epinephrine in schools. Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to emergency stock supply of epinephrine in schools

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-21HouseAccompanied H604
2021-05-17JointHearing scheduled for 05/20/2021 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29SenateSenate concurred
2021-03-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Education

Same As/Similar To

H604 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
H630 (Similar To) 2021-03-29 - Senate concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback