MA H5293 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on September 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to ranked choice voting in the town of Concord. Election Laws. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to ranked choice voting in the Town of Concord
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-10-24 | House | Reporting date extended to Saturday December 31, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-09-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-09-19 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Same As/Similar To
S485 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
S2438 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2437 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3719 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
H3712 (Similar To) 2022-01-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 7 of the Acts of 2022
H825 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
H777 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4207 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4885 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2438 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2437 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3719 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
H3712 (Similar To) 2022-01-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 7 of the Acts of 2022
H825 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
H777 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4207 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4885 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5293 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5293.pdf |