MA H4207 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on October 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to ranked choice voting in the town of Arlington. Election Laws. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to ranked choice voting in the town of Arlington
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-07-30 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2022-04-19 | House | House concurred |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Sunday July 31, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-01-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/19/2022 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-10-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Same As/Similar To
H825 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
S485 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
S1367 (Similar To) 2021-09-02 - New draft (Velis) substituted, see S2523
S1369 (Similar To) 2021-12-20 - Amended by striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of S2589
H777 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2523 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 29 of the Acts of 2022
H4885 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5293 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S485 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
S1367 (Similar To) 2021-09-02 - New draft (Velis) substituted, see S2523
S1369 (Similar To) 2021-12-20 - Amended by striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of S2589
H777 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2523 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 29 of the Acts of 2022
H4885 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5293 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4207 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4207.pdf |