MA H5175 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5065
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on August 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-08 - See H5065
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-08 - See H5065
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
So much of the message from His Excellency the Governor returning with his disapproval of item 1100-2517 contained in section 2, of certain wording contained in item 1790-3011 in section 2D, and of sections 3, 4, 13 and 15 of the engrossed Bill Financing the General Governmental Infrastructure of the Commonwealth [see House, No. 5065] (for message, see House, No. 5175). August 4, 2022.
Title
So much of the message from His Excellency the Governor returning with his disapproval of item 1100-2517 contained in section 2, of certain wording contained in item 1790-3011 in section 2D, and of sections 3, 4, 13 and 15 of the engrossed Bill Financing the General Governmental Infrastructure of the Commonwealth [see House, No. 5065] (for message, see House, No. 5175). August 4, 2022
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-08 | House | See H5065 |
Same As/Similar To
H5065 (Replaced by) 2022-08-08 - Referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4047 (Similar To) 2021-08-05 - See H4005
H4049 (Similar To) 2021-08-05 - See H4008
H4051 (Similar To) 2021-08-05 - See H4010
H4048 (Similar To) 2021-08-05 - See H4007
H4053 (Similar To) 2021-08-05 - See H4012
H5213 (Similar To) 2022-09-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 219 of the Acts of 2022
H4678 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - See H4578
H4052 (Similar To) 2021-08-05 - See H4011
H4047 (Similar To) 2021-08-05 - See H4005
H4049 (Similar To) 2021-08-05 - See H4008
H4051 (Similar To) 2021-08-05 - See H4010
H4048 (Similar To) 2021-08-05 - See H4007
H4053 (Similar To) 2021-08-05 - See H4012
H5213 (Similar To) 2022-09-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 219 of the Acts of 2022
H4678 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - See H4578
H4052 (Similar To) 2021-08-05 - See H4011
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5175 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5175.pdf |