MA H5065 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4807
Note: Legislation replaced by H5175
Note: Legislation replaced by H5175
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Vetoed on August 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-08 - Referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on August 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-08 - Referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
The committee of conference on the disagreeing votes of the two branches with reference to the Senate amendment of the House Bill financing the general governmental infrastructure of the Commonwealth (House, No. 4807), reports recommending passage of the accompanying bill (House, No. 5065).
Title
Financing the general governmental infrastructure of the Commonwealth
Sponsors
House House Committee on Ways and Means | House Joint Committee on Bonding, Capital Expenditures and State Assets |
Roll Calls
2022-07-26 - Senate - Senate Enacted Roll Call #220 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-08 | House | Referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2022-08-08 | House | For message, see H5175 |
2022-08-04 | House | Governor returned to the House with veto |
2022-08-04 | Signed (in part) by the Governor, Chapter 140 of the Acts of 2022 | |
2022-07-26 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2022-07-26 | Senate | Enacted -see Roll Call #220 (Yeas 39 to Nays 0) |
2022-07-26 | House | Enacted - 153 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY, No. 233) |
2022-07-25 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2022-07-25 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2022-07-21 | Senate | Committee of conference report accepted, in concurrence |
2022-07-21 | Senate | Rules suspended by a vote of 7 to 1 |
2022-07-21 | House | Committee of conference report accepted |
2022-07-21 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-07-21 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance |
2022-07-21 | House | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2022-07-21 | House | Reported on H4807 |
2022-07-21 | House | Reported from the committee on conference |
Same As/Similar To
H4807 (Replaced by) 2022-07-21 - Reported by H5065
H4790 (Similar To) 2022-05-19 - Published as amended, see H4807
H4336 (Similar To) 2022-05-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4759
S1826 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
S598 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2734
H5175 (Replaced by) 2022-08-08 - See H5065
H4790 (Similar To) 2022-05-19 - Published as amended, see H4807
H4336 (Similar To) 2022-05-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4759
S1826 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
S598 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2734
H5175 (Replaced by) 2022-08-08 - See H5065
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5065 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5065.pdf |
Roll Call | https://malegislature.gov/RollCall/192/SenateRollCall220.pdf |