MA H506 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to non-public school student access to the MCAS exam. Education.
Title
Relative to non-public school student access to the MCAS exam
Sponsors
Rep. Bradley Jones [R] | Rep. Nicholas Boldyga [R] | Rep. Susan Gifford [R] | Rep. Fred Barrows [R] |
Rep. Hannah Kane [R] | Rep. Kelly Pease [R] | Rep. Kimberly Ferguson [R] | Rep. David DeCoste [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-20 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2023-09-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/04/2023 from 02:00 PM-08:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H506 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H506.pdf |