MA H5012 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 374 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 374 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Roy of Franklin, a petition (subject to Joint Rules 12 and 7A) of Jeffrey N. Roy and Richard J. Ross that Gary M. Premo be authorized to buy back creditable service from the Norfolk County Retirement System. Public Service.
Title
Authorizing the Norfolk County Retirement System to grant creditable service to Gary M. Premo
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-07 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 374 of the Acts of 2018 | |
2019-01-01 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Enacted |
2018-12-31 | House | Enacted |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Bills in Third Reading report accepted |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Read third |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second, ordered to a third reading |
2018-12-28 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-12-27 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-12-27 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-12-27 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2018-12-27 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2018-12-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/26/2018 from 11:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-1 |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-12-13 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
2018-06-18 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H1331 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H2547 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1439 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H3298 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S1397 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
H2547 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1439 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H3298 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S1397 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H5012 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H5012.pdf |