MA H4935 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 24 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-10-18 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Public Safety and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to enhanced school safety. Public Safety and Homeland Security.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resolve establishing an enhanced school safety commission

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-18SenateSenate concurred
2018-10-15HouseReported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security
2018-07-24HouseReferred to the committee on House Rules

Same As/Similar To

H4914 (Similar To) 2018-12-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 319 of the Acts of 2018
H1647 (Similar To) 2018-02-14 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1866 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Accompanied H1856
H155 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H2656 (Similar To) 2018-02-14 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4971 (Similar To) 2018-12-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback