MA H1866 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H1856
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-22 - Accompanied H1856
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-22 - Accompanied H1856
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. McKenna of Webster, a petition of Joseph D. McKenna and others that the Registrar of Motor Vehicles be authorized to establish an emergency responder yellow dot program. Transportation.
Title
Establishing an emergency responder yellow dot program
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph McKenna [R] | Rep. Donald Berthiaume [R] | Sen. Peter Durant [R] | Rep. Denise Garlick [D] |
Rep. David Muradian [R] | Rep. Mathew Muratore [R] | Rep. Timothy Whelan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | House | Accompanied H1856 |
2017-12-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/06/17 from 1:00PM-3:00PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H3441 (Similar To) 2018-06-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4649
H1839 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
H1838 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
S1989 (Similar To) 2018-02-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1870 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
H1856 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1839 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
H1838 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
S1989 (Similar To) 2018-02-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1870 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
H1856 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1866 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1866.pdf |