MA H4971 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish the DHY clean waters community partnership, an inter-municipal agreement for waste water management in the towns of Dennis, Harwich, and Yarmouth. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Establishing the DHY Clean Waters Community Partnership for the towns of Dennis, Harwich and Yarmouth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-12-10 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2018-11-19 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-11-15 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
2018-10-09 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H4932 (Similar To) 2018-11-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4956
S1420 (Similar To) 2017-07-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 48 of the Acts of 2017
H2636 (Similar To) 2018-04-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4437
H3201 (Similar To) 2017-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3768
H3684 (Similar To) 2018-01-29 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4157
S1420 (Similar To) 2017-07-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 48 of the Acts of 2017
H2636 (Similar To) 2018-04-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4437
H3201 (Similar To) 2017-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3768
H3684 (Similar To) 2018-01-29 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4157
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4971 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4971.pdf |