MA H4824 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on June 26 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-12 - Hearing scheduled for 07/15/2024 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only
Pending: Joint Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 26 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-12 - Hearing scheduled for 07/15/2024 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only
Pending: Joint Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a Historic Connecticut River Water Trail marking trust fund. Environment and Natural Resources.
Title
Relative to the Historic Connecticut River Water Trail
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/15/2024 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2024-07-03 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-07-01 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Environment and Natural Resources |
2024-06-26 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4824 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4824.pdf |