MA H4808 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Replaces legislation H4802
Note: Replaces legislation S2799

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-07-09 - Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading
Pending: House Bills in the Third Reading Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

House bill No. 4802, as amended and passed to be engrossed by the House. June 24, 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Making appropriations for the fiscal year 2020 to authorize certain COVID-19 spending in anticipation of federal reimbursement

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-02 - Senate - Senate Engrossed Roll Call #209 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-09HouseReferred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading
2020-07-02SenatePassed to be engrossed -see Roll Call #209 (Yeas 39 - Nays 0)
2020-07-02SenateReprinted as amended, see S2799
2020-07-02SenateRead third
2020-07-02SenateOrdered to a third reading
2020-07-02SenateAmendment by striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of S2789, as amended
2020-07-02SenateRead second
2020-06-29SenateCommittee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, inserting in place thereof the text of S2789
2020-06-25SenateOrder relative to subject matter adopted
2020-06-25SenateRead; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2020-06-24HousePassed to be engrossed - 158 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 188)
2020-06-24HouseH4802, published as amended

Same As/Similar To

H4802 (Replaces) 2020-06-24 - Published as amended, see H4808
S2799 (Replaces) 2020-07-02 - See H4808

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback