MA H4796 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4990
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 26 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-08-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4990
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 26 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-08-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4990
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Sherborn be authorized to convert one license for the sale of wine and malt beverages not to be drunk on the premises to a license for the sale of all alcoholic beverages not to be drunk on the premises. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Sherborn to convert a certain liquor license
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-12 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4990 |
2024-07-29 | House | Recommitted to the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
2024-07-29 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-07-29 | House | Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) |
2024-07-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/12/2024 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2024-06-27 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-06-26 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
S2714 (Similar To) 2024-04-25 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4176 (Similar To) 2024-07-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4867
H4893 (Similar To) 2024-08-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4992
H4990 (Replaced by) 2024-09-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4992 (Similar To) 2024-09-05 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4176 (Similar To) 2024-07-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4867
H4893 (Similar To) 2024-08-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4992
H4990 (Replaced by) 2024-09-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4992 (Similar To) 2024-09-05 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4796 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4796.pdf |