MA H4760 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H4626
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 181 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 181 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Division of Capital Asset Management and Maintenance to convey a certain easement to the town of New Salem
Title
Authorizing the Division of Capital Asset Management and Maintenance to convey a certain easement to the town of New Salem
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2018-07-31 - House - House On Enactment Land Taking Yea and Nay No. 488 (Y: 151 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-31 - House - House On Enactment Land Taking Yea and Nay No. 488 (Y: 151 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-31 - Senate - Senate Enacted - Roll Call #551 [YEAS 36 to NAYS 0] (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-07-31 - House - House On Enactment Land Taking Yea and Nay No. 488 (Y: 151 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-31 - Senate - Senate Enacted - Roll Call #551 [YEAS 36 to NAYS 0] (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-09 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 181 of the Acts of 2018 | |
2018-07-31 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2018-07-31 | Senate | Enacted - Roll Call #551 [YEAS 36 to NAYS 0] |
2018-07-31 | House | Enacted - 151 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 488) |
2018-07-30 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2018-07-30 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2018-07-30 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-07-30 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2018-07-30 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-07-27 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-07-27 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-07-27 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-07-27 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-07-27 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2018-07-27 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2018-07-16 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2018-07-16 | House | New draft of H4626 |
2018-07-16 | House | Reported from the committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H4626 (Replaces) 2018-07-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4760
S1704 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4683
H3632 (Similar To) 2018-05-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4440
H3670 (Similar To) 2017-06-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 27 of the Acts of 2017
H3833 (Similar To) 2017-11-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 123 of the Acts of 2017
H3972 (Similar To) 2017-11-07 - Amendment #1 (Jones) adopted
H4839 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 184 of the Acts of 2018
H4837 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 193 of the Acts of 2018
H4838 (Similar To) 2018-07-31 - Enacted - 151 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 510)
H4923 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S1704 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4683
H3632 (Similar To) 2018-05-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4440
H3670 (Similar To) 2017-06-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 27 of the Acts of 2017
H3833 (Similar To) 2017-11-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 123 of the Acts of 2017
H3972 (Similar To) 2017-11-07 - Amendment #1 (Jones) adopted
H4839 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 184 of the Acts of 2018
H4837 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 193 of the Acts of 2018
H4838 (Similar To) 2018-07-31 - Enacted - 151 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 510)
H4923 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken