MA H4696 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-8)
Status: Introduced on April 27 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-22 - Hearing scheduled for 05/27/2020 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
Pending: Joint Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure Committee
Hearing: May 27 @ 11:00 am in Virtual Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to school trip refunds during a declared state of emergency. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to school trip refunds for parents

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-22JointHearing scheduled for 05/27/2020 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2020-05-07SenateSenate concurred
2020-04-29HouseReported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure
2020-04-27HouseReferred to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback