MA H4454 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-13 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-13 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Huntington be authorized to establish the appointed office of town clerk in said town. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Establishing the appointed office of town clerk in the town known as Huntington
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-13 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2024-05-28 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2024-05-23 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2024-05-02 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2024-05-02 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-05-02 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2024-04-08 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2024-03-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/08/2024 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H3985 (Similar To) 2024-02-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 29 of the Acts of 2024
S2009 (Similar To) 2024-06-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4675
H4875 (Similar To) 2024-09-30 - Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2009 (Similar To) 2024-06-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4675
H4875 (Similar To) 2024-09-30 - Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4454 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4454.pdf |