MA H4447 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4940
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4940
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4940
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to further regulate the Devens Regional Enterprise Zone. Economic Development and Emerging Technologies.
Title
To enhance growth and economic development at Devens
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-29 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4940 |
2022-02-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/04/2022 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-09 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Economic Development and Emerging Technologies |
2022-02-07 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H3159 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4969
H4862 (Similar To) 2022-07-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5017
H5017 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 222 of the Acts of 2022
H4940 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4862 (Similar To) 2022-07-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5017
H5017 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 222 of the Acts of 2022
H4940 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4447 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4447.pdf |