MA H4434 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2418
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 29 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-18 - Committee of conference appointed (Wolf-Brownsberger-Fattman), in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 29 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-18 - Committee of conference appointed (Wolf-Brownsberger-Fattman), in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Substituted by the House, on motion of Mr. Scibak of South Hadley, for a bill with the same title (House, No. 4323). June 27, 2016.
Title
Relative to the judicial enforcement of noncompetition agreements
Sponsors
Rep. John Scibak [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-18 | Senate | Committee of conference appointed (Wolf-Brownsberger-Fattman), in concurrence |
2016-07-18 | Senate | Senate insisted on its amendments |
2016-07-18 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2016-07-18 | House | Committee of conference appointed (Dempsey-Scibak-Barrows) |
2016-07-18 | House | House NON-concurred in the Senate amendment |
2016-07-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-07-14 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2016-07-14 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-07-14 | Senate | For Senate action see S2418 |
2016-07-14 | Senate | Amended by striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of S2418 |
2016-07-14 | Senate | Read second |
2016-07-11 | Senate | Order relative to subject matter adopted |
2016-07-11 | Senate | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for Thursday, July 14, 2016 with an amendment, inserting in place thereof the text of S2418 |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2016-06-29 | House | Passed to be engrossed 150 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 288) |
2016-06-29 | House | Amendment 15 adopted |
2016-06-29 | House | Amendment 13 adopted |
2016-06-29 | House | Read third |
2016-06-29 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-06-27 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-06-27 | House | Substituted for H4323 |
Same As/Similar To
S2418 (Replaced by) 2016-07-14 - See H4434
H944 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H1032 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
H2056 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
H945 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H943 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H944 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H1032 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
H2056 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
H945 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H943 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4434 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4434.pdf |