MA H4405 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 125 of the Acts of 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 125 of the Acts of 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Burlington be authorized to appoint Ryan DeCoste as a firefighter in said town, notwithstanding the maximum age requirement. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Directing the town of Burlington Fire Department to waive the maximum age requirement for firefighter for Ryan DeCoste
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-02 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 125 of the Acts of 2024 | |
2024-06-27 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2024-06-27 | House | Enacted |
2024-06-27 | Senate | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2024-06-13 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2024-05-28 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2024-05-23 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2024-05-02 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2024-05-02 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-05-02 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2024-04-08 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2024-02-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/04/2024 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-15 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4405 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4405.pdf |