MA H4373 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4751
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4751
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4751
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Madaro of Boston, a petition of Adrian C. Madaro (with the approval of the mayor and city council) that the Boston Retirement Board be authorized to increase the accidental disability retirement allowance payable to Richard Cintolo, a retired police officer of the city of Boston. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Regarding the disability pension for Richard Cintolo
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4751 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-04-07 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday April 29, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-03-07 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday April 11, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-02-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/11/2022 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-01-31 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H2697 (Similar To) 2021-12-30 - Accompanied S1722
H3757 (Similar To) 2022-12-29 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H5451
H3758 (Similar To) 2022-12-29 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H5452
H3759 (Similar To) 2022-12-29 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H5453
H4374 (Similar To) 2022-05-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4753
H4751 (Replaced by) 2022-12-29 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H5454
H5454 (Similar To) 2023-01-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 428 of the Acts of 2022
H3757 (Similar To) 2022-12-29 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H5451
H3758 (Similar To) 2022-12-29 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H5452
H3759 (Similar To) 2022-12-29 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H5453
H4374 (Similar To) 2022-05-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4753
H4751 (Replaced by) 2022-12-29 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H5454
H5454 (Similar To) 2023-01-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 428 of the Acts of 2022
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4373 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4373.pdf |