MA H2697 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-30 - Accompanied S1722
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-30 - Accompanied S1722
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to disability pensions for violent crimes committed against certain public employees. Public Service.
Title
Relative to disability pensions for violent crimes
Sponsors
Rep. Patrick Kearney [D] | Rep. Steven Xiarhos [R] | Rep. Christopher Hendricks [D] | Rep. Jessica Giannino [D] |
Rep. Hannah Kane [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-30 | Senate | Accompanied S1722 |
2021-09-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/21/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S1722 (Similar To) 2021-12-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2642 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3757 (Similar To) 2022-12-29 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H5451
H3758 (Similar To) 2022-12-29 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H5452
S2410 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2409 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2087 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S963 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H3759 (Similar To) 2022-12-29 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H5453
H4373 (Similar To) 2022-05-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4751
H4374 (Similar To) 2022-05-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4753
H2642 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3757 (Similar To) 2022-12-29 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H5451
H3758 (Similar To) 2022-12-29 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H5452
S2410 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2409 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2087 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S963 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H3759 (Similar To) 2022-12-29 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H5453
H4373 (Similar To) 2022-05-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4751
H4374 (Similar To) 2022-05-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4753
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2697 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2697.pdf |