MA H4751 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H4373
Note: Legislation replaced by H5454
Note: Legislation replaced by H5454
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on May 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-29 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H5454
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-29 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H5454
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Regarding the disability pension for Richard Cintolo
Title
Regarding the disability pension for Richard Cintolo
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-29 | House | Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H5454 |
2022-12-29 | House | Read third |
2022-05-12 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-05-12 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-05-12 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2022-05-09 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2022-05-09 | House | New draft of H4373 |
2022-05-09 | House | Reported from the committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H4373 (Replaces) 2022-05-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4751
H2697 (Similar To) 2021-12-30 - Accompanied S1722
H3757 (Similar To) 2022-12-29 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H5451
H3758 (Similar To) 2022-12-29 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H5452
H3759 (Similar To) 2022-12-29 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H5453
H5454 (Replaced by) 2023-01-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 428 of the Acts of 2022
H2697 (Similar To) 2021-12-30 - Accompanied S1722
H3757 (Similar To) 2022-12-29 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H5451
H3758 (Similar To) 2022-12-29 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H5452
H3759 (Similar To) 2022-12-29 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H5453
H5454 (Replaced by) 2023-01-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 428 of the Acts of 2022
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4751 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4751.pdf |