MA H4369 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-18 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 137 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-18 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 137 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Substituted by the House, on motion of Mr. Speliotis of Danvers, for a bill with the same title (House, No. 4264). April 4, 2018.
Title
Relative to the tenure of office of the city clerk of the city of Revere
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-18 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 137 of the Acts of 2018 | |
2018-07-09 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2018-07-09 | House | Enacted |
2018-07-05 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-07-05 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2018-04-04 | House | Passed to be engrossed |
2018-04-04 | House | Substituted for H4264 |
Same As/Similar To
H4264 (Similar To) 2018-04-04 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4369
H1912 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
H3964 (Similar To) 2017-12-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 159 of the Acts of 2017
H3874 (Similar To) 2017-08-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 74 of the Acts of 2017
H3876 (Similar To) 2017-11-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 129 of the Acts of 2017
S1676 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - New draft substituted, see S2576
H3384 (Similar To) 2017-07-17 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3811
H4972 (Similar To) 2018-12-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4993
H1912 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
H3964 (Similar To) 2017-12-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 159 of the Acts of 2017
H3874 (Similar To) 2017-08-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 74 of the Acts of 2017
H3876 (Similar To) 2017-11-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 129 of the Acts of 2017
S1676 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - New draft substituted, see S2576
H3384 (Similar To) 2017-07-17 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3811
H4972 (Similar To) 2018-12-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4993
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4369 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4369.pdf |