MA H3874 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 74 of the Acts of 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 74 of the Acts of 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the preliminary elections in the city of Revere. Election Laws. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Eliminating the preliminary election in the City of Revere in 2017
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-25 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 74 of the Acts of 2017 | |
2017-08-24 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2017-08-24 | House | Enacted |
2017-08-24 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2017-08-21 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2017-08-17 | House | Read second, ordered to a third reading, rules suspended, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2017-08-17 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-08-17 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2017-08-14 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2017-08-07 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-08-03 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Same As/Similar To
H3656 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2069 (Similar To) 2018-07-05 - New draft substituted, see S2589
H380 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H388 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H390 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S365 (Similar To) 2018-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2399
H377 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H4836 (Similar To) 2018-07-27 - Text of an amendment, see S2576
H4972 (Similar To) 2018-12-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4993
H4981 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2069 (Similar To) 2018-07-05 - New draft substituted, see S2589
H380 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H388 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H390 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S365 (Similar To) 2018-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2399
H377 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H4836 (Similar To) 2018-07-27 - Text of an amendment, see S2576
H4972 (Similar To) 2018-12-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4993
H4981 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3874 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3874.pdf |