MA H4323 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4721
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to investigations of sexual harassment and discrimination. The Judiciary.
Title
To enhance investigations of sexual harassment and discrimination
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-10 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4721 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-04-17 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 2, 2018, pending concurrence |
2018-04-03 | Joint | Hearing canceled – new hearing TBD |
2018-04-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/10/2018 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2018-04-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/10/2018 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-03-19 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on the Judiciary |
2018-02-05 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H2326 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H828 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H3605 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
S2301 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2499
H4721 (Replaced by) 2018-07-10 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H828 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H3605 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
S2301 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2499
H4721 (Replaced by) 2018-07-10 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4323 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4323.pdf |