MA S2301 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2499
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2499
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2499
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to enhance investigations of sexual harassment and discrimination. The Judiciary.
Title
To enhance investigations of sexual harassment and discrimination
Sponsors
Sen. Cynthia Creem [D] | Rep. Kenneth Gordon [D] | Sen. Walter Timilty [D] | Sen. Cindy Friedman [D] |
Sen. Jason Lewis [D] | Sen. James Eldridge [D] | Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-30 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2499 |
2018-04-25 | House | House concurred |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 2, 2018, pending concurrence |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Recommitted to the committee on The Judiciary |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) |
2018-03-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/12/2018 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2018-02-12 | House | House concurred |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
H2326 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H828 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H3605 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H4323 (Similar To) 2018-07-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
S2499 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H828 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H3605 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H4323 (Similar To) 2018-07-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
S2499 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2301 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2301.pdf |