MA H4287 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4501
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4501
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4501
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Bill Title: An Act authorizing the town of Franklin to impose a local sales tax on the sale of medical marijuana By Mr. Roy of Franklin, a petition of Jeffrey N. Roy and Richard J. Ross (by vote of the town) that the town of Franklin be authorized to establish a local sales tax on the sale of medical marijuana in said town. Revenue. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Franklin to impose a local sales tax on the sale of medical marijuana
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-29 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4501 |
2014-07-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2014 from 11:30 AM-12:30 PM in B-1 |
2014-07-11 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-07-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H4501 (Replaced by) 2014-09-29 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H4287 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H4287.pdf |