MA H4247 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S3170
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 382 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 382 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Clinton be authorized to recognize certain streets as public ways. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Clinton to accept certain streets as public ways
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-04 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 382 of the Acts of 2022 | |
2023-01-03 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2023-01-03 | House | Enacted |
2023-01-03 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment |
2022-12-29 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading |
2022-12-29 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed |
2022-12-29 | Senate | New text (Cronin) substituted, see S3170 |
2022-12-29 | Senate | Read third |
2022-12-29 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2022-04-26 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2022-02-03 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-03 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-02-03 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2022-01-31 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2022-01-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/18/2022 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-11-17 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-11-10 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H3409 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3736 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1675 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H1607 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H3439 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4944
H3896 (Similar To) 2021-11-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 85 of the Acts of 2021
H2182 (Similar To) 2022-07-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 101 of the Acts of 2022
H2183 (Similar To) 2022-03-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 38 of the Acts of 2022
H2704 (Similar To) 2021-10-06 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H418 (Similar To) 2022-12-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5438
S3170 (Replaced by) 2022-12-29 - See H4247
H3736 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1675 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H1607 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H3439 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4944
H3896 (Similar To) 2021-11-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 85 of the Acts of 2021
H2182 (Similar To) 2022-07-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 101 of the Acts of 2022
H2183 (Similar To) 2022-03-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 38 of the Acts of 2022
H2704 (Similar To) 2021-10-06 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H418 (Similar To) 2022-12-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5438
S3170 (Replaced by) 2022-12-29 - See H4247
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4247 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4247.pdf |