MA H2182 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 101 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 101 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the management of Fuller Field in the town of Clinton. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to the management of Fuller Field in the town of Clinton
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-30 - Senate - Senate Enacted Roll Call #199 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - House - House Enacted (Y: 155 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - House - House Enacted (Y: 155 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-06 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 101 of the Acts of 2022 | |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Enacted -see Roll Call #199 (Yeas39 to Nays 0) |
2022-06-23 | House | Enacted - 155 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 203 ) |
2022-06-21 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2022-06-21 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2021-08-23 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2021-07-19 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2021-07-19 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-07-19 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2021-07-14 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2021-06-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/22/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H2183 (Similar To) 2022-03-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 38 of the Acts of 2022
H2704 (Similar To) 2021-10-06 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H418 (Similar To) 2022-12-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5438
H3740 (Similar To) 2021-06-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3896
H4247 (Similar To) 2023-01-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 382 of the Acts of 2022
H4246 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4669
H3896 (Similar To) 2021-11-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 85 of the Acts of 2021
H2704 (Similar To) 2021-10-06 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H418 (Similar To) 2022-12-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5438
H3740 (Similar To) 2021-06-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3896
H4247 (Similar To) 2023-01-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 382 of the Acts of 2022
H4246 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4669
H3896 (Similar To) 2021-11-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 85 of the Acts of 2021