MA H4217 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5133
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H5133
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H5133
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the expansion of the Boston Convention and Exhibition Center. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Relative to the expansion of the Boston convention and exhibition center
Sponsors
Rep. David Biele [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-07 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5133 |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-04-30 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday July 31, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-02-05 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday May 1, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-01-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/27/2020 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-11-19 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-11-18 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
2019-10-28 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H2977 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
S945 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H2916 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
S397 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S2403 (Similar To) 2020-07-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2876
H5133 (Replaced by) 2020-12-07 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S945 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H2916 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
S397 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S2403 (Similar To) 2020-07-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2876
H5133 (Replaced by) 2020-12-07 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4217 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4217.pdf |