MA S2403 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2876
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2876
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2876
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the expansion of the Boston Convention and Exhibition Center. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Relative to the expansion of the Boston Convention and Exhibition Center
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-31 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2876 |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-04-30 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday July 31, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-02-05 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday May 1, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-01-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/27/2020 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-11-12 | House | House concurred |
2019-11-07 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
2019-11-07 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2019-10-21 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
S1944 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S1909 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
H2977 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
S945 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H2916 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
S2876 (Replaced by) 2020-07-31 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1909 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
H2977 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
S945 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H2916 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
S2876 (Replaced by) 2020-07-31 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2403 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2403.pdf |