MA H419 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish standards for medical gas piping systems. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
To establish standards for medical gas piping systems
Sponsors
Rep. John Lawn [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-06-06 | House | Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-03-31 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday June 1, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-03-09 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2021-06-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/08/2021 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H419 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H419.pdf |