MA H4175 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2270
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on November 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-06 - Text of an amendment, see S2270
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-06 - Text of an amendment, see S2270
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Similar Bills
Title
Similar Bills
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-06 | House | Text of an amendment, see S2270 |
Same As/Similar To
S2270 (Replaced by) 2020-02-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 26 of the Acts of 2020
S1201 (Similar To) 2019-06-13 - New draft substituted, see S2252
S1676 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S459 (Similar To) 2019-11-18 - Reported (in part) by S2410
S1911 (Similar To) 2019-04-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2201
H790 (Similar To) 2019-07-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3946
S2410 (Similar To) 2019-11-20 - Passed to be engrossed - see Roll Call #150 [36 YEAS - 4 NAYS]
S2422 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Rules
S1201 (Similar To) 2019-06-13 - New draft substituted, see S2252
S1676 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S459 (Similar To) 2019-11-18 - Reported (in part) by S2410
S1911 (Similar To) 2019-04-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2201
H790 (Similar To) 2019-07-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3946
S2410 (Similar To) 2019-11-20 - Passed to be engrossed - see Roll Call #150 [36 YEAS - 4 NAYS]
S2422 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4175 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4175.pdf |