MA S459 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H732
Note: Legislation replaced by S2410
Note: Legislation replaced by S2410
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-3)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-18 - Reported (in part) by S2410
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-18 - Reported (in part) by S2410
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to protect the natural resources of the commonwealth. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Protecting the natural resources of the commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-18 | Senate | Reported (in part) by S2410 |
2019-10-30 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2019-10-30 | Senate | Accompanied by H732 |
2019-04-17 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 04/23/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in 222 |
2019-04-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/23/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H2438 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
S893 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H732 (Replaces) 2019-10-30 - Accompanied S459
S2410 (Replaced by) 2019-11-20 - Passed to be engrossed - see Roll Call #150 [36 YEAS - 4 NAYS]
S2422 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Rules
S893 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H732 (Replaces) 2019-10-30 - Accompanied S459
S2410 (Replaced by) 2019-11-20 - Passed to be engrossed - see Roll Call #150 [36 YEAS - 4 NAYS]
S2422 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S459 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S459.pdf |